1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 46 CHAPTER 51 Relative to California Ocean Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 11, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 46, Pellerin. California Ocean Day.This measure would declare April 11, 2023, as California Ocean Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Our identity as Californians is inextricably tied to the Pacific Ocean and our majestic coastline; andWHEREAS, The ocean is an essential habitat and natural resource that supports Californias incredible array of marine life, as well as its $44 billion ocean economy; andWHEREAS, The ocean provides a nature-based solution for the climate crisis by absorbing 90 percent of the warming of our planet; andWHEREAS, Protecting the unique biodiversity of the ocean builds resilience of habitats and species over time; andWHEREAS, The ocean delivers multiple societal benefits, including the food we eat, the medicine we rely on, the jobs that sustain our communities, and cultural connectivity; and WHEREAS, The ocean holds social, cultural, and traditional significance, especially to the original stewards of this land, the indigenous communities of California, who have protected the ocean for centuries and continue to do so in the present day; andWHEREAS, Californias coastal counties are home to 68 percent of the states population; andWHEREAS, The ocean is a major attraction for millions of Californians, providing an array of recreational opportunities that are important to local economies and promoting a strong connection to place and overall human well-being; andWHEREAS, Californias ocean and coastal resources require careful management in the face of climate change and other ocean- and land-based stressors; andWHEREAS, Inequitable access to the ocean and coast by Black, Indigenous, People of Color, low-income, and marginalized communities has been historically unaddressed; andWHEREAS, The Legislature has a responsibility to center equity and strengthen partnerships with Californias diverse communities in ensuring a healthy ocean for future generations; andWHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the dedication and commitment to our ocean by all of the participants in World Oceans Day, including legislators, legislative staff, state agency officials, and ocean advocates from across the state; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature, in recognition of the importance of the ocean to the well-being of this state, declares April 11, 2023, as California Ocean Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 05, 2023 Passed IN Senate May 04, 2023 Passed IN Assembly April 17, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 46Introduced by Assembly Member Pellerin(Principal coauthor: Senator Gonzalez)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Boerner Horvath, Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, McKinnor, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)(Coauthor: Senator Nguyen)March 23, 2023 Relative to California Ocean Day.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 46, Pellerin. California Ocean Day.This measure would declare April 11, 2023, as California Ocean Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Our identity as Californians is inextricably tied to the Pacific Ocean and our majestic coastline; andWHEREAS, The ocean is an essential habitat and natural resource that supports Californias incredible array of marine life, as well as its $44 billion ocean economy; andWHEREAS, The ocean provides a nature-based solution for the climate crisis by absorbing 90 percent of the warming of our planet; andWHEREAS, Protecting the unique biodiversity of the ocean builds resilience of habitats and species over time; andWHEREAS, The ocean delivers multiple societal benefits, including the food we eat, the medicine we rely on, the jobs that sustain our communities, and cultural connectivity; and WHEREAS, The ocean holds social, cultural, and traditional significance, especially to the original stewards of this land, the indigenous communities of California, who have protected the ocean for centuries and continue to do so in the present day; andWHEREAS, Californias coastal counties are home to 68 percent of the states population; andWHEREAS, The ocean is a major attraction for millions of Californians, providing an array of recreational opportunities that are important to local economies and promoting a strong connection to place and overall human well-being; andWHEREAS, Californias ocean and coastal resources require careful management in the face of climate change and other ocean- and land-based stressors; andWHEREAS, Inequitable access to the ocean and coast by Black, Indigenous, People of Color, low-income, and marginalized communities has been historically unaddressed; andWHEREAS, The Legislature has a responsibility to center equity and strengthen partnerships with Californias diverse communities in ensuring a healthy ocean for future generations; andWHEREAS, The Legislature recognizes the dedication and commitment to our ocean by all of the participants in World Oceans Day, including legislators, legislative staff, state agency officials, and ocean advocates from across the state; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature, in recognition of the importance of the ocean to the well-being of this state, declares April 11, 2023, as California Ocean Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|