1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 48 CHAPTER 59 Relative to autism. [ Filed with Secretary of State May 18, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 48, Mathis. Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.This measure would declare the support of the Legislature for the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs for people with autism, and would encourage families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2023, which is National Autism Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3,500,000 Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often utilize specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support their families resilience as they manage the unique psychological and financial conditions autism presents; andWHEREAS, Attending a movie theater with family members is an enriching and enjoyable experience for many Californians; andWHEREAS, Theaters around the country have begun to offer sensory-friendly screenings as a special opportunity for individuals with autism and others to enjoy their favorite films in a safe and accepting setting; andWHEREAS, In order to provide a more comfortable and accepting environment for individuals on the autism spectrum, the movie auditorium keeps the sound turned slightly down and the lights turned slightly up; andWHEREAS, Because some individuals with autism have specialized dietary needs, families are allowed to bring their own snacks from home; andWHEREAS, Audience members are free to get up and dance, walk, sing, or shout, and are able to relax and enjoy quality family time without worrying if someone will complain or be disturbed by movement or noise; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature supports and promotes the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs, and encourages families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2023, which is National Autism Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled May 15, 2023 Passed IN Senate May 11, 2023 Passed IN Assembly April 20, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 48Introduced by Assembly Members Mathis, Grayson, Lackey, and Ramos(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alanis, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Flora, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gipson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jackson, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lee, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, McCarty, McKinnor, Muratsuchi, Stephanie Nguyen, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Wallis, Ward, Weber, Wicks, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)March 28, 2023 Relative to autism. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 48, Mathis. Autism: sensory-friendly movie screenings.This measure would declare the support of the Legislature for the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs for people with autism, and would encourage families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2023, which is National Autism Awareness Month.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Autism is a pervasive developmental disorder affecting the social, communication, and behavioral skills of those affected by it; andWHEREAS, More than 3,500,000 Americans live with an autism spectrum disorder; andWHEREAS, Individuals with autism often utilize specialized and community support services to ensure their health and safety, and to support their families resilience as they manage the unique psychological and financial conditions autism presents; andWHEREAS, Attending a movie theater with family members is an enriching and enjoyable experience for many Californians; andWHEREAS, Theaters around the country have begun to offer sensory-friendly screenings as a special opportunity for individuals with autism and others to enjoy their favorite films in a safe and accepting setting; andWHEREAS, In order to provide a more comfortable and accepting environment for individuals on the autism spectrum, the movie auditorium keeps the sound turned slightly down and the lights turned slightly up; andWHEREAS, Because some individuals with autism have specialized dietary needs, families are allowed to bring their own snacks from home; andWHEREAS, Audience members are free to get up and dance, walk, sing, or shout, and are able to relax and enjoy quality family time without worrying if someone will complain or be disturbed by movement or noise; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature supports and promotes the expansion of sensory-friendly movie screenings and similar programs, and encourages families to attend a sensory-friendly movie screening during April 2023, which is National Autism Awareness Month; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|