06/23/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2023. | |||
06/23/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 06/12/2023 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2218.). | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1105.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1371.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Com. on A., E., S., & T. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | Introduced. To print. |