05/24/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2023. | |||
05/24/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1105.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1370.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | Introduced. To print. |