1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 65 CHAPTER 92 Relative to Star Wars Day. [ Filed with Secretary of State June 09, 2023. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 65, Alanis. Star Wars Day.This measure would declare May 4, 2023, as Star Wars Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Star Wars is a film series and science fiction and fantasy universe created by George Lucas that became one of the most successful and influential franchises in motion picture history; andWHEREAS, George Lucas was born and raised in the City of Modesto. He attended Modesto Junior College and spent his early adult life exploring cinematography. Mr. Lucas transferred to the University of Southern California School of Cinematic Arts, where he began making films, learning from industry leaders, and ultimately writing and directing the first Star Wars film, creating a pop culture phenomenon; and WHEREAS, The first movie, Star Wars: A New Hope, was released in 1977 and was made on a budget of only $11,000,000. It won six Academy Awards, along with a special achievement award for its accomplishments in sound, and revolutionized the motion picture industry with its achievements in special effects; andWHEREAS, Since then, the Star Wars franchise has captured the imaginations and hearts of many and has remained a beloved franchise into the 21st century; andWHEREAS, May the Fourth be with you, which started as a pun warmly shared by fans, has become a full-fledged fan-embraced celebration of Star Wars; andWHEREAS, In 2012, the Walt Disney Company acquired the Star Wars franchise, providing new opportunities to expand on this galaxy far, far away, bringing a larger and more dynamic universe with fresh content, including films, books, comics, and television shows, and introducing this beloved universe to a new generation of fans; and WHEREAS, With the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge in 2019, located in Disneyland Park at the Disneyland Resort in the City of Anaheim, California, fans from all over the world are now able to visit and share in the fully immersive and collective Star Wars experience; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 4, 2023, as Star Wars Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled June 02, 2023 Passed IN Senate June 01, 2023 Passed IN Assembly May 04, 2023 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20232024 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 65Introduced by Assembly Members Alanis and Quirk-Silva(Coauthors: Assembly Members Addis, Aguiar-Curry, Alvarez, Arambula, Bains, Bauer-Kahan, Bennett, Berman, Boerner, Bonta, Bryan, Calderon, Juan Carrillo, Wendy Carrillo, Cervantes, Chen, Connolly, Megan Dahle, Davies, Dixon, Essayli, Mike Fong, Vince Fong, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Garcia, Gipson, Grayson, Haney, Hart, Holden, Hoover, Irwin, Jones-Sawyer, Kalra, Lackey, Low, Lowenthal, Maienschein, Mathis, McCarty, Stephanie Nguyen, Ortega, Pacheco, Papan, Jim Patterson, Joe Patterson, Pellerin, Petrie-Norris, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Rodriguez, Blanca Rubio, Sanchez, Santiago, Schiavo, Soria, Ta, Ting, Valencia, Villapudua, Waldron, Ward, Weber, Wilson, Wood, and Zbur)April 20, 2023 Relative to Star Wars Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 65, Alanis. Star Wars Day.This measure would declare May 4, 2023, as Star Wars Day.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Star Wars is a film series and science fiction and fantasy universe created by George Lucas that became one of the most successful and influential franchises in motion picture history; andWHEREAS, George Lucas was born and raised in the City of Modesto. He attended Modesto Junior College and spent his early adult life exploring cinematography. Mr. Lucas transferred to the University of Southern California School of Cinematic Arts, where he began making films, learning from industry leaders, and ultimately writing and directing the first Star Wars film, creating a pop culture phenomenon; and WHEREAS, The first movie, Star Wars: A New Hope, was released in 1977 and was made on a budget of only $11,000,000. It won six Academy Awards, along with a special achievement award for its accomplishments in sound, and revolutionized the motion picture industry with its achievements in special effects; andWHEREAS, Since then, the Star Wars franchise has captured the imaginations and hearts of many and has remained a beloved franchise into the 21st century; andWHEREAS, May the Fourth be with you, which started as a pun warmly shared by fans, has become a full-fledged fan-embraced celebration of Star Wars; andWHEREAS, In 2012, the Walt Disney Company acquired the Star Wars franchise, providing new opportunities to expand on this galaxy far, far away, bringing a larger and more dynamic universe with fresh content, including films, books, comics, and television shows, and introducing this beloved universe to a new generation of fans; and WHEREAS, With the opening of Star Wars: Galaxys Edge in 2019, located in Disneyland Park at the Disneyland Resort in the City of Anaheim, California, fans from all over the world are now able to visit and share in the fully immersive and collective Star Wars experience; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares May 4, 2023, as Star Wars Day; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|