Senate | 09/12/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Rubio. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1552.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2023 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Introduced. To print. |