07/17/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2023. | |||
07/17/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/06/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1917.) | ||
Senate | 07/05/2023 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2197.) | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Introduced. To print. |