Senate | 09/14/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2219.) | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | Introduced. To print. |