04/30/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2024. | |||
04/30/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 04/25/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3774.) | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4192.) | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | From inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2024 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Villapudua. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2023 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Villapudua. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2023 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | Introduced. To print. |