07/18/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2024. | |||
07/18/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 07/01/2024 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6112.). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2024 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2024 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 29). | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4777.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Essayli. To Third Reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2023 | Introduced. To print. |