Senate | 08/31/2024 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Gonzalez. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5304.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 5068.) | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2024 | Introduced. To print. |