08/28/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2024. | |||
08/28/2024 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 08/22/2024 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2024 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) | ||
Senate | 08/14/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Senate | 07/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2024 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 5949.) | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | Introduced. To print. |