09/14/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/14/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2475.) | ||
Senate | 07/13/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 12). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2023 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 2002.) | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2023 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2023 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2023 | Introduced. To print. |