09/20/2023 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2023. | |||
09/20/2023 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |||
Assembly | 09/12/2023 | Enrolled measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2475.) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2481.) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2023 | Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2482.) | ||
Senate | 06/21/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 20). | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 1548.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2023 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 2). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2023 | Introduced. To print. |