LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR107
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR107
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR107
Action History
Assembly
07/03/2024
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6157.).
Assembly
07/01/2024
Ordered to third reading.
Assembly
07/01/2024
From Consent Calendar.
Assembly
06/26/2024
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25).
Assembly
06/17/2024
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Assembly
06/12/2024
Introduced.