Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Read. Adopted. (Page 4477.). | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2024 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 18). | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2024 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2024 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2024 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2024 | Introduced. |