LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR87
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR87
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR87
Action History
Assembly
04/18/2024
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0.).
Assembly
04/18/2024
Coauthors revised.
Assembly
04/16/2024
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
Assembly
04/15/2024
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
Assembly
04/08/2024
Referred to Com. on RLS.
Assembly
04/03/2024
Introduced.