|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 908, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5507.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 6507.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4047.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|