Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2024
|
June 24 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4178.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3968.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3290.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|