California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill August 19, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024