|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 924, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5728.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6895.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3968.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
April 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3351.) (March 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
March 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Set for hearing March 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|