LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1026
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1026
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1026
Action History
Senate
03/11/2024
March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/11/2024
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Senate
03/01/2024
Set for hearing March 20.
Senate
02/14/2024
Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB S.
Senate
02/07/2024
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
Senate
02/06/2024
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.