Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3607.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Set for hearing April 15. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |