Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
June 25 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4209.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3968.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3755.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|