Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/29/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5639.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 16. Page 6719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 1. Page 4091.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3969.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3721.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|