Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5087.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 6246.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4012.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3662.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|