Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
July 2 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
June 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3970.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3753.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3528.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|