Assembly | 08/15/2024 | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2024 | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4147.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3970.) (May 16). | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2024 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Set for hearing April 9. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |