Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3970.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3606.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 15 in HUMAN S. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|