LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1086
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1086
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2023-2024 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1086
Action History
Senate
04/10/2024
April 10 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 4. Page 3563.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/19/2024
Set for hearing April 10.
Senate
02/21/2024
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Senate
02/13/2024
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
Senate
02/12/2024
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.