06/14/2024 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2024. | |||
06/14/2024 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/12/2024 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5791.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |