Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3564.) (April 10). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |