Senate | 05/16/2024 | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2024 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2024 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3721.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3427.) (April 1). | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Set for hearing April 1. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |