|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 879, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5770.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 7004.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4179.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3972.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
April 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
April 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
March 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|