Assembly | 06/13/2024 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2024 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5792.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3509.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3449.) (April 2). | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Set for hearing April 2. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on PUB S. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |