|
07/02/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 76, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4628.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5792.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3575.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3447.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|