|
08/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 6248.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4014.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3730.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3468.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|