|
08/19/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 6250.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3918.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3379.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Set for hearing March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|