California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 8, 2024
Bill June 17, 2024
Bill March 21, 2024