Assembly | 08/28/2024 | Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | July 2 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 6.) | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | June 4 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4017.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3820.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |