California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1142 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill July 3, 2024
Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024