|
09/29/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 989, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5738.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 5699.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5629.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 3. Page 6791.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 4100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3973.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3635.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3467.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|