|
09/28/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 881, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 5649.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 6794.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2024
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4030.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3973.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3755.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3660.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|