Senate | 04/23/2024 | April 22 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 6. Page 3701.) | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Set for hearing April 24 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |