California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1152 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 19, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 1, 2024