Senate | 04/17/2024 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |