California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1155 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2024
Bill August 16, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill April 18, 2024