|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 783, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6320.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3531.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|