Assembly | 08/15/2024 | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2024 | June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2024 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 4022.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2024 | Read third time and amended. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2024 | Set for hearing April 22. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3467.) (April 3). | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |