Assembly
|
08/15/2024
|
August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4210.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3974.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3753.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3532.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|